Desmarais, Rene Leo (CPSO#: 21763)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rene L. Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012