Desouza, Trevor Terence (CPSO#: 27914)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor T. Desouza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 28 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 04 Jul 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015