Desrochers, Marie (CPSO#: 27328)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2000