Deutsch, Alexander Aaron (CPSO#: 41836)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Liverpool, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1989