Deutsch, James William (CPSO#: 52914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yale University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Treatment Centres
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 363-3751
Fax: (416) 363-7945
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Deutsch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Deutsch ( CPSO# 52914 )

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centres
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM DEUTSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEUTSCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987