Deutsch, James (CPSO#: 26770)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2008