Dev, Anoop (CPSO#: 60777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Islington Ave.
Unit A13
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: (905) 893-8218
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Yorkland Road
4th floor
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2399
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dev ( CPSO# 60777 )

Business Address:
A13 - 9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085

Business Address:
265 Yorkland Boulevard
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M2J 5C7
Phone Number: (416) 229-2399

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANOOP DEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1990