Devarajan, Karthika (CPSO#: 86474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
701 Sheppard Ave East
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 901-7701
Fax: (416) 901-7706
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karthika Devarajan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Devarajan ( CPSO# 86474 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 901-7701

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARTHIKA DEVARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVARAJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012