Devereaux, Philip James (CPSO#: 69774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Population Health Research Inst
David Braley Cardiac Vascular and
Stroke Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40654
Fax: (905) 297-3778
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
Room 346
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40654
Fax: (905) 297-3778
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devereaux Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Douglas ( CPSO# 70512 )
Dr. P. Devereaux ( CPSO# 69774 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
Population Health Research Inst
David Braley Cardic Vascular and
Stroke Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP JAMES DEVEREAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVEREAUX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 12 Feb 1996 to 10 Mar 1996
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2000