Devgan, Ravi (CPSO#: 28421)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 27 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jan 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Apr 2003
Summary:

On April 30, 2003 the Discipline Committee found Dr. Devgan to have committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that he charged a fee that was excessive in relation to the service performed; made a 
misrepresentation respecting a remedy, treatment or device; placed himself in a conflict of interest, and engaged in conduct 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
On June 26, 2003, the Discipline Committee held a penalty hearing. On June 27, 2003 the 
Discipline Committee revoked Dr. Devgan s certificate of registration. 
 
On May 28, 2003, Dr. Devgan appealed the finding of professional misconduct by the Discipline 
Committee to the Divisional Court. On July 3, 2003, Dr. Devgan also appealed the penalty order 
of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.  Pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the 
Statutory Powers and Procedures Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee is stayed as a 
result of the appeal and, therefore, the penalty would not take effect pending the outcome of the 
appeal. 
 
The College brought a motion to lift the stay on September 25, 2003.  On September 26, 2003, 
the Divisional Court refused to lift the stay so long as the following conditions are complied with 
and until the appeal is concluded. 
 
1.    Dr. Devgan will file proof of the ordering of the transcript within 7 days. 
2.    Dr. Devgan will not offer carnivora, TVZ-7, or any other like substances to patients 
      diagnosed with cancer. 
3.    Dr. Devgan will not enter into any financial arrangements with patients other than for the 
      proper payment of reasonable professional fees. 
4.    Dr. Devgan will not sell any drugs or therapeutic preparations to his patients at a profit. 
5.    Dr. Devgan will cooperate with the College s employees who may make reasonable 
      inspections of his office books and records of all kinds to ensure these conditions are 
      being complied with. 
 
The College brought a further motion to lift the stay of the penalty order. On January 27, 2004, 
the Divisional Court made an interim order to lift the stay pending its decision on the motion.  
On February 11, 2004, the Divisional Court granted the College s motion to lift the stay .  
Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is now in effect and Dr. Devgan s certificate 
of registration is revoked effective January 27, 2004 at 11:59 pm. 
 
On January 31, 2005, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Devgan s appeal. On February 9, 2005, 
Dr. Devgan filed a motion for leave to appeal to the Court of Appeal. On July 25, 2005, the Court 
of Appeal denied the motion for leave to appeal and awarded costs to the College of $1,500. 
Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in effect. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 31 Jul 2005
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 2002


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 1993
Summary:

 In March 1993, Dr. Devgan pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(4) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he had a conflict of interest.  The 
 Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Devgan guilty of professional misconduct.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Devgan be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
 to be recorded on the Register, and that the Doctor be fined the amount of $5000.00.  The 
 Committee further ruled that failure to pay said fine within ten months from the day on which this 
 Order became final would result in the Registrar suspending the Doctor's licence to practise 
 medicine until payment was made.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 22 Mar 1993