Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Devi, Bijayalaxmi (CPSO#: 56593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Oriya

Education:Sambalpur University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baywood Centre
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 308
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-0702
Fax: (905) 683-8381
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Devi ( CPSO# 56593 )

Business Address:
Baywood Centre
Suite 308
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-0702

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIJAYALAXMI DEVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1997