Devi, Shashi Prabha (CPSO#: 59671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Gujarati, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 203
Willowdale ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 221-0176
Fax: 4162215418
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SHASHI PRABHA DEVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1989