Devin, Brian (CPSO#: 66588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Phone: (613) 826-2502
Fax: (613) 826-1682
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Devin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Devin ( CPSO# 66588 )

Business Address:
3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Phone Number: (613) 826-2502

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995