Devitt, Emily Paige (CPSO#: 103348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sound Care Medical Centre
1145 Hunt Club Rd
Suite 560
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone: (613) 738-2378
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sexual Health Centre
179 Clarence St
Ottawa ON  K1N 1B3
Canada
Phone: (613) 234-4641
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Devitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Devitt ( CPSO# 103348)

Business Address:
Sound Care Medical Centre
1145 Hunt Club Road
Suite 560
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone Number: (613) 738-2378

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY PAIGE DEVITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVITT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016