Devlin, Hanna Roslyn (CPSO#: 24746)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Michaels Hospital, 30 Bond Street, Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 02 Dec 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016