Devlin, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 55370)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Elizabeth Devlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Respiratory Disease

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 May 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2004