Devlin, Megan Katharine Benson (CPSO#: 95736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Infectious Diseases
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton Building 13 Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3505
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy B. Devlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Devlin ( CPSO# 50430 )
Dr. M. Devlin ( CPSO# 95736 )

Business Address:
312 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 298-2024

Business Address:
105 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 298-2024

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 295-2600

Business Address:
Medcan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-2186

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN KATHARINE BENSON DEVLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVLIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015