Devon, Jennifer Leah (CPSO#: 82912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: (416) 431-8204
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B0P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-8911
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W3W3
Canada
Phone: 4164952550
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

One kenton drive
Toronto ON  M2R2H6
Canada
Phone: 6479327913
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer L. Devon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Devon ( CPSO# 82912 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
c/o Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Suite 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
One Kenton Drive
Toronto ON  M2R 2H6
Phone Number: (647) 932-7913

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEAH DEVON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007