Devon, Karen Michelle (CPSO#: 80909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: (416) 323-6308
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Devon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Devon ( CPSO# 80909 )

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MICHELLE DEVON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012