Devraj-Kizuk, Rozemin (CPSO#: 61175)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 1999