Deyell, Marc William (CPSO#: 80604)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2004 to 12 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2004