Dhaliwal, Amarinder Singh (CPSO#: 63737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
900 Raylawson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H7
Phone: (905) 796-1444
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amarinder Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 63737 )

Business Address:
3 - 900 Raylawson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H7
Phone Number: (905) 796-1444

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMARINDER SINGH DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992