Dhaliwal, Harinder Singh (CPSO#: 84003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
A1-Endoscopy
1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital--Civic Campus
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16723
Fax: (613) 761-4020
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. S. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 84003 )

Business Address:
A1-Endoscopy
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARINDER SINGH DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2006 to 28 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008