Dhaliwal, Harjinder Singh (CPSO#: 65750)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2009