Dhaliwal, Jaskaren Kaur (CPSO#: 90521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Mann, Jaskaren Kaur (used until: 29 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
456 Vodden St. East
Brampton ON  L6S 5Y7
Phone: 905 497 8155
Fax: 905 497 8955
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Canada
Phone: 905 846 9255
Fax: 905 846 2525
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaskaren K. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 90521 )

Business Address:
4 - 456 Vodden Street East
Brampton ON  L6S 5Y7
Phone Number: (905) 497-8155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASKAREN KAUR DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011