Dhaliwal, Preet Bans Kaur (CPSO#: 74808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
22 Mill Street West
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone: (519) 682-2307
Fax: (519) 682-9979
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Preet Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 74808 )

Business Address:
22 Mill Street West
PO Box 760
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 682-2307

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREET BANS KAUR DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002