Dhaliwal, Ranjit Singh (CPSO#: 52934)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1996