Dhaliwal, Yadvinder Singh (CPSO#: 54802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Manchester, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Airport Medical Centre
Unit 127
2980 Drew Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A7
Phone: (905) 678-6365
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-0087
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

50 Rolling Hills Boulevard
Orangeville ON  L9W 4W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 942-0040
Fax: (519) 942-0048
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yadvinder Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Dhaliwal ( CPSO# 54802 )

Business Address:
Airport Medical Centre
Suite 127
2980 Drew Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 678-6365

Business Address:
Suite 101
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 792-0087

Business Address:
14 Fifth Avenue
Orangeville ON  L9W 1G2
Phone Number: (519) 942-0040

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YADVINDER SINGH DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 May 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Sep 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Mar 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Nov 2012
Summary:

On November 5, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dhaliwal committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional 
conduct. Dr. Dhaliwal admitted the allegation. 
 
Dr. Dhaliwal is a family physician practising in Mississauga, Ontario. In 2003, Dr. Dhaliwal was 
found to have engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct relating to loans 
that he solicited and received from seven of his patients. The finding of professional misconduct 
was made on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, which stated that Dr. 
Dhaliwal still owed money to some of the patients, but that he had paid back a couple called 
Patient F and Patient G. Dr. Dhaliwal had borrowed over $50,000 from Patients F and G in 1999, 
and two cheques provided in repayment had been returned for insufficient funds.  Dr. Dhaliwal 
testified under oath at the 2003 hearing that he had paid back Patients F and G in full.  However, 
this was not true. 
 
In May 2003, five months before the 2003 hearing, Dr. Dhaliwal visited the home of Patients F 
and G with his wife and a relative.  The patients were asked to and agreed to withdraw their 
complaint in return for an offer from Dr. Dhaliwal to pay $1,000 a month until the loan was 
repaid in full. Patients F and G signed a letter, requested by the Dhaliwals, stating they had been 
repaid the money and did not want to continue with any investigation, and sent this to the 
College.  
 
Dr. Dhaliwal paid Patients F and G $1,000 a month as he had agreed to do for a period of five or 
six months. Thereafter the payments began to drop in frequency and amount. In 2008, Dr. 
Dhaliwal paid nothing towards repayment of the loan. 
 
In April 2009, Patient F advised the College that the letter sent to the College in 2003 stating he 
and his wife had been repaid was untrue. He explained that since that time, they had received 
about $10,000 in small instalments. After they notified the College, Dr. Dhaliwal's wife 
contacted Patient F to advise him that a $30,000 payment was available to him and his wife in 
return for signing papers again withdrawing their complaint with the College.  Patient F attended 
at Dr. Dhaliwal's office and picked up a bank draft for $30,000.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered a public reprimand and a three-month suspension of Dr. 
Dhaliwal's certificate of registration. Dr. Dhaliwal was further ordered to pay costs to the College 
in the amount of $3,650. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 5, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Oct 2003
Summary:

On October 9, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Dhaliwal to have committed acts of 
professional misconduct with respect to conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by using his 
position as a physician to encourage or pressure 7 patients to lend to him, directly or indirectly, various sums of money which 
he promised to repay with interest on certain terms, but which he failed, refused or neglected to repay as promised. 
 
On October 10, 2003, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. 
 
On January 15, 2004, the Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
 
1.    Dr. Dhaliwal shall attend before the panel to be reprimanded, such reprimand be recorded on the register. 
 
2.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Dhaliwal s certificate of registration for ten (10) months.    The first four (4) months of the 
      suspension to begin on a date to be fixed by the Registrar. The second six (6) months of the suspension shall be 
      eighteen months after completion of the four (4) month suspension. The second six-month suspension shall be 
      suspended if he complies with the following terms and conditions. 
 
(i)      Dr. Dhaliwal makes restitution to Mr. A and Mrs. B in the amount of seventy five thousand dollars ($75,000.00). 
(ii)     Dr. Dhaliwal makes restitution to Mr. C in the amount of thirty three thousand dollars ($33,000.00). 
###(iii) Dr. Dhaliwal provide proof to the satisfaction of the Registrar that full payment to these patients has been made 
         prior to the start date of the six (6) month suspension. 
(iv) Dr. Dhaliwal satisfactorily complete an Ethics course approved by the Registrar, at his expense, and provides proof that he 
         has completed the course to the satisfaction of the Registrar by December 1, 2005. 
 
3.    It is the intention of the Committee that Dr. Dhaliwal serve the full ten (10) month period of suspension if for any 
      reason he is unable to make restitution to the patients whether because of his bankruptcy or for any other reason. 
 
4.    The Committee further orders that Dr. Dhaliwal pay five thousand dollars ($5,000) towards the cost of these 
      proceedings. 
    
On February 10, 2004, Dr. Dhaliwal appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).  Pursuant to ss.25(1) of the Statutory Powers 
Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the 
appeal.   On April 6, 2005, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Dhaliwal s appeal and awarded 
$2,500 in costs to the College.  Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 06 Apr 2005
Hearing Date(s): Oct 09, 2003