Dhalla, Aminmohamed (CPSO#: 60823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3850 Finch Avenue East
Suite 309
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T6
Phone: (416) 292-2002
Fax: (416) 292-0358
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aminmohamed Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhalla ( CPSO# 60823 )

Business Address:
309 - 3850 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1T 3T6
Phone Number: (416) 292-2002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMINMOHAMED DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1990