Dhalla, Shayesta (CPSO#: 67985)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997