Dhalla, Zahir Abdulsultan Kassam (CPSO#: 54148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 301
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 225-2131
Fax: (613) 225-2849
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charania & Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Dhalla ( CPSO# 54148 )
Dr. S. Charania ( CPSO# 59526 )

Business Address:
301 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 225-2131

Business Address:
107 - 900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 825-8476

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHIR ABDULSULTAN KASSAM DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986