Dhamanaskar, Kavita Prashant (CPSO#: 77171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Dec 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS - Juravinski Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42562
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 103
2000 Credit Valley Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

SouthMount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-4551
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

West Lincoln Memorial hospital
Dept. of Diagnostic Imaging
169 Main St E
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 945-2253 Ext. 323
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Norfolk General Hospital
Dept. of Diagnostic Imaging
365 West St.
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K and P Dhamanaskar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhamanaskar ( CPSO# 77171 )
Dr. P. Dhamanaskar ( CPSO# 78711 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queens Way West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7297

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 387-3551

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
HHS - Juravanski Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2066

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2001 to 31 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Kavita Prashant Dhamanaskar may practise medicine independently in
            Diagnostic Radiology, only.