Dhamanaskar, Prashant Kamalakar (CPSO#: 78711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Sep 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Dhamanskar, Prashant Kamalakar (used until: 17 Dec 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department Of Pathology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5644
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
Department Of Pathology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 9058487100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K and P Dhamanaskar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhamanaskar ( CPSO# 77171 )
Dr. P. Dhamanaskar ( CPSO# 78711 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queens Way West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7297

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
HHS - Juravanski Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2066

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 387-3551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Feb 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Prashant Kamalakar Dhamanaskar may practise medicine independently.

            2.    Dr. Prashant Kamalakar Dhamanaskar may practice only in the areas of
                  medicine in which  Dr. Dhamanaskar is educated and experienced.