Dhami, Karan Singh (CPSO#: 88393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M1
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karan S. Dhami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhami ( CPSO# 88393 )

Business Address:
Unit 8
5307 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M1
Phone Number: (613) 746-6223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARAN SINGH DHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHAMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2011