Dhanani, Al-Noor (CPSO#: 56749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 132
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 270-2300
Fax: (905) 270-0290
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Noor Dhanani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhanani ( CPSO# 56749 )

Business Address:
Suite 132
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 270-2300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AL-NOOR DHANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1987