Dhanani, Harsha Narendra (CPSO#: 43017)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988