Dhanani, Sonny (CPSO#: 72660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Critical Care
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3654
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dhanani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhanani ( CPSO# 72660 )
Dr. L. Lai ( CPSO# 72948 )

Business Address:
CHEO - Critical Care
Suite 3343
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONNY DHANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2003