Dhani, Neesha Cindy (CPSO#: 76114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Dept of Medical Oncology: OPG 7-817
700 University Ave, Toronto
ON M5G 1Z5
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2361
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEESHA CINDY DHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006