Dhanidina, Muhammad Karim (CPSO#: 65615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: Dhanidina, Mohammad Karim (used until: 09 May 1994 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3554
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bramton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. OR
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch st
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Ontario Colonoscopy Clinics
40 Westmore Drive Suite 209
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3Y6
Canada
Phone: 41 6749 9444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. K. Dhanidina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dhanidina ( CPSO# 65615 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD KARIM DHANIDINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANIDINA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Mar 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1996