Dhanoa, Avtar Singh (CPSO#: 65166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malay, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Mysore University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1474 Pickwick Drive
Unit 5B
Mississauga ON  L5V 2G2
Phone: (905) 812-5552
Fax: (905) 812-5553
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVTAR SINGH DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.
The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

1. On November 1, 2017, Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of operating a motor vehicle while his ability to operate a motor vehicle was impaired by alcohol or a drug contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. Dr. Dhanoa is prohibited from operating a motor vehicle on any street, road, highway or other public place for a period of 12 months from November 1, 2017. Dr. Dhanoa was also ordered to pay a fine of $1000, plus a victim surcharge of $300.

2. On March 26, 2018, Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of assault contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code. Dr. Dhanoa was given a conditional discharge with 3 years’ probation, and a victim surcharge of $100. Dr. Dhanoa was also ordered to have bodily substances taken for forensic DNA analysis.