Dharampal, Navjit Kaur (CPSO#: 110762)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 18 Oct 2016 to 14 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2016