Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dharamshi, Shafik Nazerali (CPSO#: 56750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9255 Woodbine Avenue
Unit #4
Markham ON  L6C 1Y9
Phone: (905) 887-0737
Fax: (905) 887-3671
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital
General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8181
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough
Rouge Valley Health - Centenary
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7404
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shafik Dharamshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dharamshi ( CPSO# 56750 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
9255 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 371-2120

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8181

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health-Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAFIK NAZERALI DHARAMSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHARAMSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1987