Dharmalingam, Sudharshan (CPSO#: 72810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
307 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 451-2967
Fax: (905) 595-0204
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dharmalingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dharmalingam ( CPSO# 72810 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 457-7730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDHARSHAN DHARMALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHARMALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Jul 1998
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2001