Dharssi, Karim (CPSO#: 86458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
100 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone: (705) 326-8335
Fax: (705) 326-6365
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Dharssi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dharssi ( CPSO# 86458 )

Business Address:
400 - 100 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone Number: (705) 326-8335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIM DHARSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHARSSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009