Dhatt, Deepinderjit Reena (CPSO#: 62637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northeastern Ontario Medical Office
Suite 205
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 586-3601
Fax: (705) 586-3602
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reena Dhatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dhatt ( CPSO# 62637 )

Business Address:
2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 205
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601


Corporation Name: Dhatt and McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKay ( CPSO# 63475 )
Dr. D. Dhatt ( CPSO# 62637 )

Business Address:
Northeastern Travel Clinic
Suite 205
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPINDERJIT REENA DHATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991