Dhawan, Pankaj Mukunklal (CPSO#: 61899)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Gujarat University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Jan 1989 to 30 Apr 1989
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2006