Dhesy-Thind, Sukhbinder Kaur (CPSO#: 69948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: Dhesy, Sukhbinder Kaur (used until: 25 Feb 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dhesy-Thind Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhesy-Thind ( CPSO# 69948 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKHBINDER KAUR DHESY-THIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHESY-THIND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2001