Dhillon, Amit S (CPSO#: 98799)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2016