Dhillon, Anureet Kaur (CPSO#: 85510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 113
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone: (905) 794-4088
Fax: (905) 794-4259
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anureet Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhillon ( CPSO# 85510 )

Business Address:
Unit 113
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 794-4088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUREET KAUR DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007