Dhillon, Gurmeet Singh (CPSO#: 59516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5214 Main Street
Amherst NY  14221
United States
Phone: (716) 839-2600
Fax: (716) 839-6700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado
USA - Kentucky
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURMEET SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989